The Literacy Pirates Limited

Charity number: 1145115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download