The Literacy Pirates Limited

Charity number: 1145115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/05/2020 31/08/2020
Total gross income £403.27k £401.91k £513.55k £892.47k £254.32k
Total expenditure £361.00k £412.13k £513.81k £709.61k £144.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £35.23k £39.31k N/A
Income from government grants £68.81k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £469.29k £787.46k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £4.73k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £43.38k £62.13k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £877 £1.29k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £36.87k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £450.34k £575.59k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £63.47k £134.01k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.38k £4.89k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A