BARNET BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1144512
Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £350 £825 £265 £1.58k £3.20k
Total expenditure £500 £492 £242 £1.62k £2.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A