ZOE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1148045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.10k £2.50k £1.19k £1.26k £1.70k
Total expenditure £1.85k £1.66k £2.76k £1.35k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A