Trustees UKRAINE CHRISTIAN PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1144824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Green Trustee 30 March 2021
None on record
IAN VALE Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
TIMOTHY ABBOTT Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
Professor Andrew Cope Trustee 13 February 2017
THE KENNEDY TRUST FOR RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH
Received: On time
CAROL TUBBS Trustee 28 November 2011
None on record
DR WEBB-PEPLOE Trustee 28 November 2011
None on record
ANDREW TARCY MBA Trustee 23 October 2011
None on record
DAVID DARLING Trustee 23 October 2011
None on record