LONDON CHURCH LEADERS

Charity number: 1145750
Charity reporting is up to date (255 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £58.80k £63.22k £62.86k £52.91k £56.14k
Total expenditure £55.91k £60.93k £53.08k £55.61k £71.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A