LONDON CHURCH LEADERS

Charity number: 1145750
Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lt Col David Shakespeare Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
Rev Moses Gyimah Owusu-Sekyere Trustee 16 September 2019
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND Received: On time
RT REVD JONATHAN CLARK Trustee 01 February 2016
THE BISHOP OF SOUTHWARK'S LENT FUND Received: On time
SAFE PASSAGE INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
THE WHITGIFT FOUNDATION Received: On time
Monsignor Martin Hayes Trustee 01 April 2015
SEIDS Recently registered
Rev Philip Edward BARNARD Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Rev. Dr. Jongikaya Zihle Trustee 01 March 2019
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS Received: On time
FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Rev Fedelia Onyuku-Opukiri Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
Monsignor Matthew Dickins Trustee 01 May 2015 None on record
The Venerable Luke MILLER Chair 16 September 2019 None on record