LONDON ALL NATIONS KOREAN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1144932
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £55.99k £68.62k £75.31k £56.47k £50.86k
Total expenditure £47.84k £70.74k £71.56k £55.19k £51.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A