Financial history DURHAM SCHOOL LANGLEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.25k £182.67k £12.01k £14.34k £22.72k
Total expenditure £14.06k £4.68k £3.37k £2.63k £1.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A