Financial history MDS UK PATIENT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1145214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £111.69k £204.15k £156.18k £93.98k £180.51k
Total expenditure £73.92k £144.00k £151.28k £309.34k £156.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A