Trustees MDS UK PATIENT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1145214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Peel Chair 28 April 2017
None on record
ANTHONY STEVEN ALLEN Trustee 01 October 2021
THE FRIENDS OF SCADBURY PARK
Received: On time
Lin Holder Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Claudia Richards Trustee 21 July 2017
None on record
Christine Charlwood Trustee 28 April 2017
None on record
Russell Cook Trustee 23 January 2015
None on record
Don Barrett Trustee 23 January 2015
None on record
SOPHIE WINTRICH Trustee 22 December 2011
None on record