Trustees SURFERS AGAINST SEWAGE

Charity number: 1145877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Crockett Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
Richard Malcolm Walker Trustee 04 December 2018
FAUNA & FLORA INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
Lucy Danielle Siegle Trustee 04 December 2018
None on record
DR Heather Jane Koldewey Trustee 08 April 2017
None on record
Jon Khoo Trustee 08 April 2017
None on record
LAUREN DAVIES Trustee 26 November 2012
None on record
LESLEY KAZAN-PINFIELD Trustee 13 February 2012
None on record
Chris Hides Trustee 13 February 2012
None on record