Financial history THE LORD MAYOR OF KINGSTON UPON HULL'S CHARITY APPEAL

Charity number: 1145980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £35.74k £28.84k £25.89k £23.40k £1.76k
Total expenditure £28.94k £35.05k £27.52k £27.27k £16.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A