Financial history NETWORK OF BUDDHIST ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 1145950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.67k £1.47k £3.54k £1.90k £1.72k
Total expenditure £2.00k £2.01k £3.03k £1.54k £1.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A