GURU NANAK SOCIETY OF LONDON TRUST

Charity number: 1148670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 August 2020 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 31 August 2020 62 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 February 2020 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 February 2020 226 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 July 2018 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 July 2018 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 22 May 2018 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 18 May 2018 322 days late Download