THE FROEBEL TRUST

Charity number: 1145128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Holli Williams Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Professor Jean-Noel Ezingeard Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Dr Sultana Choudhry Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
JANE WHINNETT Trustee 24 March 2014 None on record
MARK NEALE CB Chair 01 August 2013 None on record
DR Peter Elfer Trustee 10 June 2014 None on record
Catriona Helen Gill Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
Dr Lucy Frances Parker Trustee 28 September 2019 None on record
Michael Pearson Trustee 31 January 2017 None on record
Lilah Woods Trustee 28 November 2019 None on record
Dr Sharon Colilles Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
Abha Pandya Hurri Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record