MADINA EDUCATION LTD

Charity number: 1145577
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 November 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 November 2021 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2021 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 15 August 2017 On time Download