Financial history ROEHAMPTON TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1146841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £8.73k £15.30k £400 £5.33k £8.70k
Total expenditure £9.04k £7.02k £8.42k £9.60k £6.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A