Trustees THE PEWSEY AND DISTRICT FEAST AND CARNIVAL

Charity number: 1145832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Louise Parsons Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Andrea Saunders Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Julia Ann Marshall Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record
Alison Creasey-Benjamin Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record
Michael High Trustee 20 March 2018
None on record
James Walker Trustee 13 April 2016
None on record
Carol Parsons Trustee 05 December 2013
BOUVERIE HALL
Received: On time