UNIVERSITY OF SUSSEX STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1147242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 June 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 18 June 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 13 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 20 December 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 21 June 2016 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 20 January 2016 On time Download