UNIVERSITY OF SUSSEX STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1147242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £5.58m £5.82m £6.26m £6.45m £5.13m
Total expenditure £5.45m £5.75m £5.98m £6.38m £5.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £5.12m £5.31m £5.62m £5.79m £4.52m
Income - Charitable activities £456.12k £506.06k £589.30k £626.28k £580.68k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £74 £40 £395 £1.95k £1.15k
Income - Other £7.36k £3.74k £49.96k £29.33k £22.92k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.11m £2.33m £2.51m £2.65m £2.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.33m £3.42m £3.48m £3.73m £2.85m
Expenditure - Governance £28.82k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0