Trustees TOWCESTER CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1145755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristina Morris | Chair | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Margaret Walter OBE | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Douglas Rocker | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Millin | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Christina Abrams | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Roberts | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Clinch | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Robinson | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hinson | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.