Trustees MERSEY YOUTH SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1147153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON JAMES WALKER Chair 29 March 2012
None on record
Stephanie Wright Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Lynne Jones Trustee 12 March 2019
SOUTH SEFTON DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: 43 days late
CREATE UK LIMITED
Received: On time
John Corless Trustee 30 November 2016
None on record
ALASTAIR MAXWELL STODDART Trustee 12 May 2015
YOUTH FEDERATION LIMITED
Received: On time
ROBERT DOUGLAS WHITMORE Trustee 29 March 2012
None on record