Financial history SUTTERTON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (SUTTERTON SHARE)

Charity number: 502575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.84k £4.04k £4.04k £4.49k £3.33k
Total expenditure £4.04k £4.43k £4.43k £4.04k £3.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A