ROTHERHAM RESCUE RANGERS

Charity number: 1146955
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 November 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required