HIGHBRIDGE AREA FOODBANK

Charity number: 1147076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 10 March 2020 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required