HIGHBRIDGE AREA FOODBANK

Charity number: 1147076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £4.03k £6.64k £5.28k £6.23k £22.17k
Total expenditure £2.15k £4.80k £3.60k £4.89k £7.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.50k