Financial history GREAT LEVER EDUCATION AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1146143
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £103.02k £78.75k £150.81k £124.65k £131.66k
Total expenditure £102.68k £76.75k £133.78k £101.96k £89.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £15.77k N/A N/A