BURGESS HILL YOUTH

Charity number: 1149304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Louise Mount Trustee 02 November 2016 None on record
JACQUELINE COOPER Chair 04 January 2017
SUSSEX CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIMITED Received: On time
Helen James Preece Trustee 05 May 2015 None on record
Kelly Amanda Harris Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
Kathryn Anne Thomas Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
Cameron Thomas Gregory Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record