Accounts and annual returns ENSEMBLE PLUS ULTRA

Charity number: 1154312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 March 2022 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 08 August 2019 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 08 August 2019 130 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 05 April 2018 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required