Trustees ENSEMBLE PLUS ULTRA

Charity number: 1154312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Francois Feuillat Chair 16 June 2014
None on record
Fionnuala Kennedy Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Jane Cooper Trustee 05 October 2016
None on record
Andrew Hochhauser QC Trustee 01 February 2016
THE SAMUEL COURTAULD TRUST
Received: On time
ORCHESTRA FOR THE EARTH
Received: On time
THE V&A FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MR MARK GRERE Trustee 27 November 2012
None on record