THE CHABAD JEWISH COMMUNITY OF CENTRAL LONDON

Charity number: 1146332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £1.17m £1.29m £1.78m £2.18m £1.41m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.15m £1.42m £1.16m £1.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £729.53k £710.32k £1.21m £2.00m £2.35m
Income - Other trading activities £309.10k £434.35k £418.29k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £132.14k £147.29k £156.49k £178.66k £153.64k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £110.00k
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.13m £1.26m £1.16m £1.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.96k £16.66k £156.76k £0 £94.79k
Expenditure - Governance £63.62k £38.64k £35.99k £37.83k £32.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0