TEACHER DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1147447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £501.61k £533.24k £570.93k £788.92k £790.43k
Total expenditure £466.60k £520.36k £452.71k £757.07k £785.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £269.05k £620.14k £531.57k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £373.49k £353.05k £49.12k £0 £85.70k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £118.39k £0 £58.39k
Income - Charitable activities £128.03k £180.14k £0 £110.61k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £89 £51 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £403.49k £678.31k £646.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £457.19k £520.36k £452.71k £757.07k £785.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.62k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £2.90k £0 £3.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.80k £0 £452.71k £0 £0