Trustees LICHFIELD GARRICK THEATRE
Charity number: 1147697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Hill | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Beaumont | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rachel Shouler | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Ryan | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Emma Haslam | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Catherine Price | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Philip Andrew Carter | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Councillor DEBORAH FRANCES BAKER | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.