Governance ABF THE SOLDIERS' CHARITY

Charity number: 1146420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 15 March 2012: Standard registration
  • 28 November 2013: Funds received from 1088617 THE SECOND (2001) KENYA REGIMENT TRUST
  • 16 March 2015: Funds received from 211645-1 THE GULF TRUST (ARMY AND CIVILIAN)
  • 16 March 2015: Funds received from 211645 ABF THE SOLDIERS' CHARITY
  • 15 April 2018: Funds received from 229631 THE COMMANDOS BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 03 August 2018: Funds received from 231652 THE FELLOWSHIP OF THE SERVICES HEART BENEATH FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property