Trustees ABF THE SOLDIERS' CHARITY

Charity number: 1146420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LT GEN PHILIP JONES CB CBE DL Chair 01 November 2016
None on record
Christopher Glynn Sheridan Hughes Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
Major General Paul Raymond Griffiths Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Paul Carney Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
ROWENA RUTH FELL Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
SIMON JOHN NEWTON HEALE Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
RACHEL SARAH BOOTH Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
DAVID CHARLES GEORGE LONDON Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Anthony Craufurd Scott Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record
Amanda Metcalfe Trustee 29 November 2017
None on record
Lisa Christine Worley Trustee 29 November 2017
None on record
JAMES ROUS Trustee 01 November 2016
THE COLDSTREAM GUARDS CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
MARY CATHERINE FAGAN Trustee 26 March 2014
None on record