ABINGDON STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1147016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.25k £8.64k £6.56k £7.98k £1.50k
Total expenditure £6.31k £6.81k £7.03k £6.25k £6.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A