CHAPELTOWN & HAREHILLS AREA LEARNING AND TRAINING PROJECT

Charity number: 1150283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.00k £20.00k £42.91k £34.56k £56.58k
Total expenditure £23.00k £15.00k £43.10k £34.50k £47.31k
Income from government contracts £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £10.00k N/A N/A £56.58k