Trustees NOTTINGHAM ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN EDUCATION SERVICE

Charity number: 1149466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jayne McQuillan Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
David Foskett Trustee 01 March 2023
THE GEOFFREY HARRISON FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Paul McCole Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record
Rev Simon Gillespie Trustee 20 August 2019
None on record
Angela Gillespie Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record
Katherine Mary Cohoon Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Rt Rev Patrick Joseph McKinney Trustee 03 July 2015
NOTTINGHAM ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN YOUTH SERVICE
Overdue by 17 days
NOTTINGHAM ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUSTEES
Received: On time
Laura O'Brien Trustee 01 June 2012
None on record