LISKEARD & LOOE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1146545
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.07k £16.32k £27.41k £20.10k £37.29k
Total expenditure £13.47k £18.29k £20.97k £22.55k £33.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A