Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN STRUTT MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 March 2017 31 January 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2017 Not Required