TOXTETH WOMEN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1147835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.60k £46.67k £37.85k £36.44k £32.20k
Total expenditure £23.40k £36.91k £32.74k £36.15k £33.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A