Financial history CANAL & RIVER TRUST

Charity number: 1146792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £202.90m £204.90m £210.00m £216.10m £215.40m
Total expenditure £198.10m £198.20m £201.00m £232.80m £221.30m
Income from government contracts £23.00m £8.05m £5.09m £11.69m £12.48m
Income from government grants £50.00m £50.70m £51.30m £51.90m £56.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £52.90m £56.80m £5.30m £6.40m £11.50m
Income - Other trading activities £71.70m £77.70m £76.30m £74.90m £77.30m
Income - Charitable activities £31.30m £21.90m £74.80m £83.10m £78.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £46.90m £48.40m £53.40m £51.70m £48.00m
Income - Other £100.00k £100.00k £200.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £200.00k £235.00k £33.00k £128.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £156.90m £153.00m £156.20m £194.10m £183.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.20m £45.20m £44.80m £38.70m £38.00m
Expenditure - Governance £1.00m £1.10m £500.00k £500.00k £500.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £16.40m £19.80m £8.90m £9.70m £11.30m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0