Financial history BREATHING SPACE

Charity number: 1148676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.10k £28.96k £30.46k £46.39k £33.05k
Total expenditure £30.80k £24.76k £28.98k £33.44k £28.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £4.00k £4.00k £4.96k £9.49k