HILLINGDON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1148148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £42.24k £21.57k £20.70k £22.89k £250.02k
Total expenditure £24.20k £20.41k £17.09k £21.45k £259.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.76k £0 £2.75k £860 £39.55k