BREAKTHROUGH - TRANSFORMATION TRUST

Charity number: 1148238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £765.82k £852.38k £1.06m £1.40m £1.36m
Total expenditure £485.35k £657.92k £934.15k £1.20m £1.29m
Income from government contracts £759.56k £843.02k £1.05m £1.39m £1.35m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.26k £7.27k £4.21k £3.79k £3.91k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £570 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £759.56k £843.02k £1.05m £1.39m £1.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £46 £724 £263 £405
Income - Other £0 £2.05k £0 £2.86k £1.20k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £389.78k £642.46k £931.47k £1.20m £1.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £258 £0 £70 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.47k £23.05k £0 £34.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £95.37k £15.20k £2.68k £50 £0