CULTURE CONNECT UK

Charity number: 1149119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/05/2016 01/05/2017 01/05/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020
Total gross income £1.49k £8.47k £5.00k £1.41k £2.65k
Total expenditure £1.26k £4.86k £3.85k £2.85k £4.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A