Financial history FOUNDATION FOR ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION

Charity number: 1148274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.44m £1.84m £1.97m £1.36m £1.51m
Total expenditure £2.22m £1.94m £1.96m £1.61m £1.41m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.44m £1.84m £1.97m £1.36m £1.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.22m £1.94m £1.96m £1.61m £1.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £39.87k £23.73k £24.02k £31.04k £15.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0