Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET'S OLTON SOLIHULL CHURCH OLTON SOLIHULL
Charity number: 1147836
Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Dominic Edwyn Wright | Chair | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Joy Govier | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE HILL | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Carthew | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howard Dodgeon | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Franklin Selvaraj | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julien Reville | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE HENDERSON | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE FRANCES ATKINS | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Regan Plant | Trustee | 20 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CILLA TAYLOR | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW TAYLOR | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
BEV ROBOTTOM-SCOTT | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.