CROSSWAY CHURCH

Charity number: 1148400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £67.31k £81.81k £95.90k £77.66k £94.52k
Total expenditure £71.86k £79.53k £83.18k £88.51k £80.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.00k